EP0890172 - SOLID-STATE MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZETTLER, Thomas Sebastian-Bauer-Strasse 35 D-81737 München / DE | 02 /
POCKRANDT, Wolfgang Ilmstrasse 1 D-85293 Reichertshausen / DE | 03 /
WINNERL, Josef Stefan-George-Ring 49 D-81929 München / DE | 04 /
GEORGAKOS, Georg Am Geissberg 1 D-85447 Fraunberg / DE | [1999/02] | Application number, filing date | 97918054.4 | 24.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997DE00597 | Priority number, date | DE1996112439 | 28.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612439 | [1999/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737352 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890172 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890172 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, G11C8/00 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G11C8/20 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
G11C16/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/02] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [1999/02] | English: | SOLID-STATE MEMORY DEVICE | [1999/02] | French: | MEMOIRE A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5155829 (KOO JAMES T [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5406519 (HA CHANG W [KR]) [A] 1 * column A ** column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 57; figures 2,3 * | Examination | EP0129154 |