Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979367

EP0979367 - BUTTERFLY VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control (UK) Limited
202 St. Andrew's Road
Bridport, Dorset DT6 3BS / GB
[2002/17]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
SOLENT & PRATT (ENGINEERING) LIMITED
202 St. Andrews Road
Bridport, Dorset DT6 3BS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / THURSTON, David, Frederick
Holme Cleve Sidmouth Road
Lyme Regis Dorset DT7 3EQ / GB
02 / FURNESS, John
45 St. Andrews Road
Bridport Dorset DT6 3BJ / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hammler, Martin Franz , et al
Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hammler, Martin Franz , et al
Phillips & Leigh 7 Staple Inn Holborn
London WC1V 7QF / GB
Application number, filing date97918284.701.05.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997GB01198
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850716
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979367
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979367
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16K1/226, F16K25/02
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:KLAPPENVENTILE[2000/07]
English:BUTTERFLY VALVES[2000/07]
French:SOUPAPE A PAPILLON[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
27.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
28.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2001Fee for grant paid
27.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09]
Request for further processing for:20.07.2001Request for further processing filed
20.07.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.08.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200004   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2000
31.05.200105   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE06.03.2002
FI06.03.2002
FR06.03.2002
DK06.06.2002
[2004/35]
Former [2003/46]BE06.03.2002
FI06.03.2002
DK06.06.2002
Former [2003/06]BE06.03.2002
FI06.03.2002
Former [2002/49]FI06.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]DE7022577U  (ROSISTA GMBH) [X] 1-4 * figure 4 *;
 [DA]GB2277977  (BTR PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,2,4,6 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB901607  (JAMES GORDON & CO LTD) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1931755U  (KARL ZUR STEEGE K G [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4265426  (THURSTON VICTOR N, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2107436  (WESTAD ARMATURFAB) [A] 2 * figure - *