EP0891277 - MODULAR MOTOR VEHICLE CHASSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gastesi, Ignacio Rt. 1 Box 5914 Scottsville, VA 24590 / US | [1999/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97918777.0 | 23.04.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997US06738 | Priority number, date | US19960016138P | 24.04.1996 Original published format: US 16138 P | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739936 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891277 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/04 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
B60G15/062 (EP);
B60G3/20 (EP);
B62D21/04 (EP);
B60G2200/144 (EP);
B60G2202/312 (EP);
B60G2204/129 (EP);
B60G2204/422 (EP);
B60G2206/0114 (EP);
B60G2206/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHZEUG MIT BAUKASTENARTIGEM FAHRGESTELL | [1999/03] | English: | MODULAR MOTOR VEHICLE CHASSIS | [1999/03] | French: | CHASSIS MODULAIRE POUR VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [1999/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1739535 (WRIGHT) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * page 1, line 51 - line 97; figure - * [Y] 5,6,9,10; | [Y]DE764934 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [Y] 6,10 * page 2, line 78 - line 111; figure 2 *; | [X]DE448406 (EHRHARDT) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * page 2, line 12 - line 35; figure - *; | [X]FR504990 (LE GRAIN) [X] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 31 - line 36; figure - *; | [Y]DE737775 (SCHMITT) [Y] 5,9 * page 2, line 115 - page 3, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2421351 (PAGE) [A] 6,10 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 10; figure 4 * | [A] - "DE TOMASO GUARA LA FUITE EN AVANT", REVUE AUTOMOBILE,CH,HALLWAG S.A. BERNE, (19930325), vol. 88, no. 13, page 17, XP000351051 [A] 1-11 | International search | [A]US1992496 (MARMON HOWARD C, et al); | [A]US2171904 (VIKTOR BARENYI BELA); | [A]US2228732 (KARL RABE); | [A]US3920263 (BUNDSCHUH ROBERT L); | [A]US4461218 (KUHLOW JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [A]US4746145 (FURUICHI NORIYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US5322327 (STEFFINGER KONRAD [DE]); | [A]WO9414628 (BERGHAUER BGH SERVICE GMBH [DE], et al) |