EP0925436 - DRIVE ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF REDUCING THE AMOUNT OF NOx IN THE EXHAUST GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lars Collin Consult AB Västerbergsgatan 3 S-43139 Mölndal / SE | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIN, Lars, Thorbjörn Västerbergsgatan 3 S-431 39 Mölndal / SE | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 97919043.6 | 08.09.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997EP04865 | Priority number, date | CH19960002209 | 09.09.1996 Original published format: CH 220996 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810185 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925436 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925436 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/028 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
F02D19/12 (EP,US);
F02M25/0222 (EP,US);
F02M25/0225 (EP,US);
F02M25/028 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION DER MENGE NOx IN DEN ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [1999/26] | English: | DRIVE ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF REDUCING THE AMOUNT OF NOx IN THE EXHAUST GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1999/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOTEUR ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA QUANTITE DE NOx PRESENTE DANS LES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.03.2002 | GB | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | AT | 08.09.2002 | FI | 08.09.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | BE | 30.09.2002 | CH | 30.09.2002 | LI | 30.09.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 08.09.2002 | ||
FI | 08.09.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/13] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 08.09.2002 | ||
FI | 08.09.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 08.09.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 08.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/40] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
CH | 30.09.2002 | ||
LI | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE647425 (FUEL DEV CORP) [AD] 1,2,4,7 * page 2, line 66 - line 97 * * page 2, line 114 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 6 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]GB528207 (SOLEX) [A] 1,2,7 * page 2, line 24 - line 60 * * page 2, line 85 - line 104 * * page 3, line 53 - line 90; figures 1,3 *; | [AD]GB1031295 (GARRETT CORP) [AD] 1,2,4,7 * page 2, line 61 - line 78 * * page 3, line 6 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US3862819 (WENTWORTH JR FRED A) [A] 5 * column 3, line 55 - line 61; figure 1 *; | [AD]FR2529950 (SCHMELZER CORP [US]) [AD] 1,2,4,7 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 3, line 20 - line 37 * * page 4, line 26 - line 33 * * page 5, line 13 - line 27 * * page 8, line 8 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US4459943 (GOODMAN TORONTA P [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,5 *; | [AD]US4630642 (DETWEILER CHARLES A [US]) [AD] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 37 - line 66 * * column 3, line 6 - line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US4632067 (CARLSON DREXEL T [US]) [AD] 1,7 * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 6 * * column 8, line 44 - line 46 * * column 9, line 7 - line 15 ** column 9, line 39 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [AD]GB2259326 (ENGLISH ROBERT JOEL [GB]) [AD] 1,2,7 * abstract * |