Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888597

EP0888597 - PROCESS FOR DATA COMMUNICATIONS AND A DATA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider, Bernd
Am Zschoner Berg 2
01462 Ockerwitz / DE
[1999/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Adler, Peter , et al
Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Krenkelstrasse 3
01309 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Adler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Postfach 19 24 38
01282 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date97919268.912.03.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997DE00485
Priority number, dateDE199610955612.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609556
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9735398
Date:25.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0888597
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888597
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/16, G07F7/10
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DATENKOMMUNIKATION UND DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[1999/01]
English:PROCESS FOR DATA COMMUNICATIONS AND A DATA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS[1999/01]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES APPROPRIE POUR METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1998National basic fee paid 
08.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1999Fee for grant paid
17.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199903   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.03.2000
FI31.03.2000
[2001/29]
Former [2001/11]BE31.03.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0143766  (PAULSSON KURT [SE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,13-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0491639  (TELECOM SYSTEMES MOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,13,15,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2640782  (DAIBILIAN STEPHAN [FR]);
 [A]WO9412954  (WILSON SHEILA [CA]);
 [A]DE29515737U  (RUPP CHRISTIAN DR [DE])