Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0825927 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0825927



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2255
19.09.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
15.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.12.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
02.12.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
20.08.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
18.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.08.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.08.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
09.08.2004 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 6
05.08.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
03.08.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.08.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
03.08.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.08.2004 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
28.07.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
28.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
23.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
23.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
22.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
20.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.07.2004 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 8
19.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
19.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Claims Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 117
24.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.05.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
11.05.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
05.05.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
20.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
18.07.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
01.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
08.05.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 4
07.05.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
07.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
28.02.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
27.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
27.02.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
26.02.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 4
26.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.10.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
21.10.2002 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.10.2002 Claims Appeal 3
14.10.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
10.10.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
19.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
18.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.09.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.09.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 3
03.09.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.08.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.08.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.06.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.06.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
31.05.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
31.05.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 21
31.05.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
04.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.03.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 1
26.02.2002 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
18.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
18.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 23
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
13.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
13.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
13.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.11.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.11.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 15
13.11.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
24.10.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.08.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 104
20.08.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
29.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
29.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
26.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
26.06.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
26.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
26.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
20.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
31.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.04.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.02.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
12.02.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 22
12.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
12.02.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
12.02.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.02.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.02.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
15.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
06.12.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.09.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.08.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.07.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.06.2000 N/A Opposition 1
26.06.2000 N/A Opposition 1
26.06.2000 N/A Opposition 1
22.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
10.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.05.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
08.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
03.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
03.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
03.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
03.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
01.07.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.06.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.05.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 6
05.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.04.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
17.02.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.01.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 6
21.12.1998 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.10.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.10.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
15.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.09.1998 Claims Search / examination 5
22.09.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
22.09.1998 Description Search / examination 29
22.09.1998 Description Search / examination 36
22.09.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.08.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.08.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.03.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.03.1998 Priority document Search / examination 28
29.01.1998 Annex Search / examination 19
29.01.1998 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 2
16.01.1998 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
23.12.1997 Annex Search / examination 2
23.12.1997 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.12.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.12.1997 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.12.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.12.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.12.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.12.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
01.12.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.11.1997 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
30.10.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
30.10.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36
30.10.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28
30.10.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28
30.10.1997 Priority document Search / examination 16