Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910540

EP0910540 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO ASSEMBLY LINE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cockayne, David John
5 Darell Croft, Newhall, Walmley Sutton Coldfield
West Midlands B76 1HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
Cockayne, David John
5 Darell Croft, Newhall, Walmley
Sutton Coldfield, West Midlands B76 1HU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Skerrett, John Norton Haigh , et al
Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Skerrett, John Norton Haigh , et al
H.N. & W.S. SKERRETT Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
Application number, filing date97919539.324.04.1997
[1999/17]
WO1997GB01131
Priority number, dateGB1996000850725.04.1996         Original published format: GB 9608507
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9739966
Date:30.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0910540
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910540
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Search report(s)International search reportEP30.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/08, B65G17/38
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/17]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IN, ODER IN BEZUG AUF MONTAGEANLAGE-SYSTEME[1999/17]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO ASSEMBLY LINE SYSTEMS[1999/17]
French:AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AUX SYSTEMES DE CHAINES DE MONTAGE[1999/17]
Entry into regional phase11.11.1998National basic fee paid 
11.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
30.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2000Fee for grant paid
12.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.199903   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU24.04.2001
MC30.04.2001
[2006/39]
Former [2004/39]LU24.04.2001
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2319617  (GEORGE MANIERRE) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * * IDEM * [A] 10;
 [AD]WO9426636  (WAHREN MATS [SE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1095233  (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS RENE GO)