EP0977902 - MANUFACTURE OF TWO-WAY SHAPE MEMORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litana Ltd. Rabi Akiva Street 15 58824 Holon / IL | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLOMENBLIT, Josef Rabi Akiva Street 15/12 58824 Holon / IL | 02 /
BUDIGINA, Nathaly Rabi Akiva Street 15/12 58824 Holon / IL | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919618.5 | 25.04.1997 | [2000/06] | WO1997IL00134 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849363 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977902 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977902 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/10, C22F1/18, // C22K1:00 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C22F1/006 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON ZWEIWEGFORMGEDÄCHTNISTEILEN | [2003/02] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF TWO-WAY SHAPE MEMORY DEVICES | [2000/06] | French: | FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS A MEMOIRE DE FORME BIDIRECTIONNEL | [2003/02] |
Former [2000/06] | HERSTELLUNG VON ELEMENTEN MIT ZWIWEGS FORMGEDÄCHTNIS | ||
Former [2000/06] | FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS A MEMOIRE DE FORME DANS LES DEUX SENS | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1999 | 30.04.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2004 | BE | 07.07.2004 | CH | 07.07.2004 | FI | 07.07.2004 | LI | 07.07.2004 | DK | 07.10.2004 | GR | 07.10.2004 | ES | 18.10.2004 | PT | 07.12.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/28] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
BE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 07.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8910421 (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]) [A] 1,13-16 * page 2, paragraph 3; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US4283233 (GOLDSTEIN DAVID, et al) [A] 1,13-16 * claim 1 * |