blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0896121 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0896121



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 264
08.11.2000 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
05.11.2000 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
17.07.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
06.06.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.03.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
30.12.1998 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.11.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.11.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
30.10.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 5
30.10.1998 Description Search / examination 55
30.10.1998 Drawings Search / examination 18
30.10.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.09.1998 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
03.08.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
16.12.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.11.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
06.11.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 62
06.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 24
06.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 20
06.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 22
06.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 24