blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0896121


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
10.11.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
11.07.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn
02.06.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
18.02.2000 Supplementary search report published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Change - classification published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Change - classification published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
12.05.1999 Renewal fee
23.12.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.02.1999 [1999/06]
23.12.1998 Request for examination filed published on  10.02.1999 [1999/06]
12.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
15.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.1997 PCT data prior to European publication