blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0896121
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0896121Global Dossier 05.04.2000A4
EP0896121 10.02.1999A1
Priority number Date
JP9701482 25.04.1997
JP3479497 19.02.1997
JP10697596 26.04.1996
JP11619896 10.05.1996
JP10697496 26.04.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2408597 19.11.1997A
Priority number Date
JP9701482 25.04.1997
JP3479497 19.02.1997
JP10697596 26.04.1996
JP11619896 10.05.1996
JP10697496 26.04.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9741329Global Dossier 06.11.1997A1
Priority number Date
JP3479497 19.02.1997
JP10697596 26.04.1996
JP11619896 10.05.1996
JP10697496 26.04.1996