blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0896121

Designated contracting statesBE 
DE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
Examination procedure17.07.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2000/52]
Entry into regional phase30.10.1998Translation filed 
30.10.1998National basic fee paid 
30.10.1998Search fee paid 
30.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200004   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.02.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:10.02.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981030
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000222
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7E 06B 3/66 A, 7E 06B 9/24 B
 
Event date:27.12.2000 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20000610