Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896121

EP0896121 - LIGHT-CONTROLLABLE HEAT INSULATING WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/06]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / DANNO, Kazuhisa
1-3-25, Sakurano-cho
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520 / JP
02 / IMAJO, Keiji
2-10, Midori-cho
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP
[1999/06]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/06]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97919725.825.04.1997
[1999/06]
WO1997JP01482
Priority number, dateJP1996010697426.04.1996         Original published format: JP 10697496
JP1996010697526.04.1996         Original published format: JP 10697596
JP1996011619810.05.1996         Original published format: JP 11619896
JP1997003479419.02.1997         Original published format: JP 3479497
[1999/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9741329
Date:06.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0896121
Date:10.02.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997
[1999/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/66, E06B9/24
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/06]E06B9/24
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/06]
TitleGerman:THERMISCH ISULIERTES FENSTER MIT LICHTREGELUNG[1999/06]
English:LIGHT-CONTROLLABLE HEAT INSULATING WINDOW[1999/06]
French:FENETRE D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE A APTITUDE DE REGULATION DE LA LUMIERE[1999/06]
Entry into regional phase30.10.1998Translation filed 
30.10.1998National basic fee paid 
30.10.1998Search fee paid 
30.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
30.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/06]
10.06.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/52]
17.07.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JPH0882809  (AFFINITY KK);
 [Y]JPS6383386  (ARUNA ENG KK, et al);
 [Y]JPS622775U  ;
 [Y]JPS5124774Y  ;
 [Y]JPH07279540  (SANKYO ALU IND);
 [Y]JPS60137078U  ;
 [Y]JPH07238747  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD)