Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890052

EP0890052 - A CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING OF TUBES OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELVEGAARD, Eilif
Sigrid Undsets vei 32
N-1600 Fredrikstad / NO
[1999/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/02]
Representative(s)Bjerkén, J. Hakan , et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]Bjerkén, Jarl Hakan , et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
Application number, filing date97919780.325.03.1997
[1999/02]
WO1997NO00084
Priority number, dateNO1996000132701.04.1996         Original published format: NO 961327
[1999/02]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9737164
Date:09.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0890052
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997
[1999/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0890052
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE09.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16L3/10
[1999/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/02]
TitleGerman:KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUM EINKLEMMEN VON ROHREN ODER DERGLEICHEN[1999/02]
English:A CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING OF TUBES OR THE LIKE[1999/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE POUR BLOQUER TUBES ET ANALOGUES[1999/02]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1998Translation filed 
14.10.1998National basic fee paid 
14.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
14.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/02]
07.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2000Fee for grant paid
29.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2998217  (ENGLIS CLIFTON L, et al);
 [A]US2890848  (JOHNSON JR ROBERT A);
 [A]US2937835  (JOHN CSMEREKA);
 [A]US4172578  (PATE HAROLD T [US]);
 [A]NO174402B  (ELVEGAARD EILIF [NO])