Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969776

EP0969776 - BONE ANCHORING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nobel Biocare AB
Box 5190
402 26 Göteborg / SE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LUNDGREN, Dan
Askims Kyrkväg 5
S-436 51 Hovås / SE
 [2005/38]
Former [2000/02]01 / LUNDGREN, Dan
Askims Kyrkväg 5
S-436 51 Hov s / SE
Representative(s)Ström, Tore , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Ström, Tore , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date97919798.525.02.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997SE00314
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836701
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969776
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969776
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00, A61F2/28
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:KNOCHEN-VERANKERUNGSELEMENT[2000/02]
English:BONE ANCHORING ELEMENT[2000/02]
French:ELEMENT D'ANCRAGE DANS L'OS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.02.1997Translation filed 
16.08.1999National basic fee paid 
16.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
28.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2005Fee for grant paid
17.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
10.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
09.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
IT21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
IE27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
IE27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/33]BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/22]FI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/15]FI21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI21.09.2005
SE21.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US4790753  ;
 [A]US3849887  ;
 [A]WO9114404