Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970490

EP0970490 - A CORE FOR A CONTROLLABLE INDUCTOR AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / VALDEMARSSON, Stefan
Tomteboda Gäddeholm
S-725 97 Västeras / SE
02 / HOLMGREN, Tommy
Körsbärsstigen 3
S-771 43 Ludvika / SE
03 / ZINDERS, Gunnar
Egnahemsvägen 19
S-771 51 Smedjebacken / SE
04 / SANDIN, Björn
Västerbacksvägen 13
S-771 60 Ludvika / SE
05 / ELOFSSON, Dan
Elvägen 5
S-771 42 Ludvika / SE
06 / EKWALL, Olle
Plommonstigen 27
S-771 43 Ludvika / SE
 [2004/20]
Former [2000/02]01 / VALDEMARSSON, Stefan
Tomteboda Gäddeholm
S-725 97 Väster s / SE
02 / HOLMGREN, Tommy
Körsbärsstigen 3
S-771 43 Ludvika / SE
03 / ZINDERS, Gunnar
Egnahemsvägen 19
S-771 51 Smedjebacken / SE
04 / SANDIN, Björn
Västerbacksvägen 13
S-771 60 Ludvika / SE
05 / ELOFSSON, Dan
Elvägen 5
S-771 42 Ludvika / SE
06 / EKWALL, Olle
Plommonstigen 27
S-771 43 Ludvika / SE
Representative(s)Dahlstrand, Björn , et al
ABB AB
Intellectual Property
Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dahlstrand, Björn , et al
ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property
721 78 Västeras / SE
Former [2004/17]Dahlstrand, Björn , et al
ABB AB Legal Affairs and Compliance / Intellectual Property
721 78 Västeras / SE
Former [2000/02]Olsson, Jan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
Application number, filing date97919816.526.03.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997SE00528
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843257
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970490
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970490
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/26, H01F41/02
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:MAGNETKERN FÜR EINEN STEUERBAREN INDUKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN[2000/02]
English:A CORE FOR A CONTROLLABLE INDUCTOR AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THEREOF[2000/02]
French:NOYAU DE BOBINE D'INDUCTION REGLABLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999Translation filed 
21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
04.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE12.08.2004
[2004/52]
Cited inInternational search[A]US2909742  (LAMBERTON CLIFFORD J)