Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891406

EP0891406 - DIESEL FUEL WITH ANTIFOAM ADDITIVES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/03]DIESEL FUEL AND LUBRICATING OIL ANTIFOAMS AND METHODS OF USE
[2004/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
General Electric Company
One River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
CROMPTON CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
CK WITCO CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
WITCO CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich, CT 06831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GRABOWSKI, Wojciech
3b, rue du Perron
CH-1196 Gland / CH
02 / HAUBRICHS, Rolf
5, grand-rue
CH-1204 Geneva / CH
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date97919948.604.04.1997
[1999/03]
WO1997US05150
Priority number, dateUS19960014836P04.04.1996         Original published format: US 14836 P
[1999/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9738067
Date:16.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0891406
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997
[1999/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0891406
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.10.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/28, C10M155/02, C08G77/38, C08G77/04, C07F7/08, B01D19/04, C10G33/04, C10M171/00
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/03]C10L1/28, C10M155/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/03]
TitleGerman:DIESELTREIBSTOFF MIT ANTISCHAUMMITTEL UND VERWENDUNGSMETHODEN[2004/11]
English:DIESEL FUEL WITH ANTIFOAM ADDITIVES AND METHODS OF USE[2004/11]
French:CARBURANTS DIESEL AVEC AGENTS ANTI-MOUSSANTS ET METHODE D'UTILISATION[2004/11]
Former [1999/03]ANTISCHAUMMITTEL FÜR DIESELTREIBSTOFF UND SCHMIERÖL UND VERWENDUNGSMETHODEN
Former [1999/03]DIESEL FUEL AND LUBRICATING OIL ANTIFOAMS AND METHODS OF USE
Former [1999/03]AGENTS ANTI-MOUSSANTS POUR CARBURANT DIESEL ET LUBRIFIANTS ET METHODE D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase23.09.1998National basic fee paid 
23.09.1998Search fee paid 
23.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/03]
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2004Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2004Fee for grant paid
24.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.08.2004
FI25.08.2004
DK25.11.2004
SE25.11.2004
ES06.12.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2005/22]AT25.08.2004
FI25.08.2004
DK25.11.2004
SE25.11.2004
Former [2005/13]AT25.08.2004
FI25.08.2004
SE25.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI25.08.2004
SE25.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE25.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US3381019  (MORCHOUSE EDWARD L) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 12; claims 9,10 *;
 [X]US3384599  (OMIETANSKI GEORGE M, et al) [X] 1,2,8 * column 3; example 8; claims 1,4,5 * * column 8, line 35 * * column 11, line 31 - line 35 *;
 [X]EP0475130  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3 * page 7, line 55 - page 8, line 16; examples 10,13,14; claim 14 * * page 24, line 5 *;
 [X]JPH0420531  ;
 [X]EP0398745  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920427), vol. 016, no. 176, Database accession no. (C - 0934), [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]US3381019  (MORCHOUSE EDWARD L);
 [Y]US4983702  (MUELLER KARL F [US], et al);
 [Y]US5003023  (FOSTER GEORGE N [US], et al);
 [Y]US5277968  (CANIVENC EDITH [FR]);
 [Y]US5426159  (UMEMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP]);
 [Y]US5474709  (HERZIG CHRISTIAN [DE], et al)