Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972326

EP0972326 - THREE-PHASE COMPACT ELECTRICAL BUS STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPD TECHNOLOGIES INC.
13500 Roosevelt Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19116-4299 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / YKEMA, John, I.
241 North Sproul Road
Broomall, PA 19008 / US
02 / BARBER, John, P.
4377 Stonehenge Lane
Dayton, OH 45429 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Beissel, Jean
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A.
234, route d'Arlon
B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Beissel, Jean
Office de Brevets, Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date97920030.001.04.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997US05381
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844612
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972326
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02G5/06
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE DREIPHASENBUSSTRUKTUR[2000/03]
English:THREE-PHASE COMPACT ELECTRICAL BUS STRUCTURE[2000/03]
French:STRUCTURE BUS ELECTRIQUE COMPACTE POUR COURANT TRIPHASE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase26.10.1999National basic fee paid 
26.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/04]
14.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.11.199903   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.1999
30.04.200004   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2000
30.04.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4008365  (ELMER T.CARLSON) [X] 1,2,19 * the whole document * [A] 3,4;
 [A]GB1167430  (SQUARE D COMPANY) [A] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2287502  (A.A. TOGESEN ET AL.) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US3402255  (G.H. PARKER ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure 1 *