Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828913

EP0828913 - BURGLAR-PROOF SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mayr, Gerhard
Feldstrasse 10
58256 Ennepetal / DE
[1998/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/12]
Application number, filing date97920539.025.03.1997
[1998/12]
WO1997DE00599
Priority number, dateDE199611189026.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19611890
[1998/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9736079
Date:02.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828913
Date:18.03.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828913
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:E06B5/11
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1998/12]
TitleGerman:EINBRUCHSSICHERUNG[1998/12]
English:BURGLAR-PROOF SYSTEM[1998/12]
French:SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES CAMBRIOLAGES[1998/12]
Entry into regional phase06.12.1997National basic fee paid 
06.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199903   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.03.2000
FR01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
IT01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
LU25.03.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2007/29]FI01.03.2000
FR01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
LU25.03.2000
Former [2004/35]FI01.03.2000
FR01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
Former [2003/09]FI01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
FR28.07.2000
Former [2002/23]FI01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
FR28.07.2000
Former [2001/37]FI01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
AT25.03.2000
FR28.07.2000
Former [2001/29]FI01.03.2000
GB01.03.2000
FR28.07.2000
Former [2001/16]GB01.03.2000
FR28.07.2000
Former [2001/12]GB01.03.2000
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB2285082  (BAR IT LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 3 - line 24; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-6;
 [A]GB2163802  (SALZER HEINRICH) [A] 1,2,5,6 * & DE-A-3432021, in der Anmeldung erwähnt; page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 102; figure - *