Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0902675

EP0902675 - DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING AN EXPANDING TOPSHEET AND BEING CAPABLE OF SELF-SHAPING IN USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CARLUCCI, Giovanni
Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 65
I-66100 Chieti / IT
02 / GIORGINI, Gennaro
Via Lucania, 14
I-64026 Roseto / IT
03 / D'ALESSIO, Nicola
Via S. Spacenta, 8
I-65126 Pescara / IT
04 / TAMBURRO, Maurizio
Via M. Polo, 50
I-65100 Pescara / IT
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [1999/12]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH
65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97921442.628.04.1997
[1999/12]
WO1997US07140
Priority number, dateEP1996010672129.04.1996         Original published format: EP 96106721
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9740796
Date:06.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0902675
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997
[1999/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/12]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT EINER AUSDEHNFÄHIGEN DECKSCHICHT UND MIT FÄHIGHEIT,SEINE FORM ZU ANDERNWÄHREND SEINER VERWENDUNG[1999/12]
English:DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING AN EXPANDING TOPSHEET AND BEING CAPABLE OF SELF-SHAPING IN USE[1999/12]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE COMPRENANT UNE FEUILLE SUPERIEURE EXPANSIVE ET CAPABLE DE S'ADAPTER LUI MEME AUX FORMES EN UTILISATION[1999/12]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1998National basic fee paid 
28.10.1998Search fee paid 
28.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/12]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/29]
13.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200105   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2001
30.04.200206   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2001
30.04.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]GB2296438  (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9619168  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 28, line 13 - page 32, line 7 * * page 37, line 25 - page 38, line 6; claim - *;
 [X]WO9500091  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 40, line 13 - line 24; claim - *;
 [A]WO9527457  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 30 - page 11, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0692232  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [AD]US3736931  (GLASSMAN J) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US3512530  (JONES JOHN LESLIE SR) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0293208  (LION CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * column W *
International search[X]US4041950  (JONES SR JOHN LESLIE)