Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896705

EP0896705 - DEVICE FOR PLAYING GAMES VIA A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, AND A GAMES SYSTEM USING A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
[1999/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PIETERSE, Rob
Verbenalaan 1
NL-2111 ZL Aerdenhout / NL
02 / PORS, Mark, Albert
Okanhout 71
NL-2719 KV Zoetermeer / NL
03 / DE LANGE, Martin, Klaas
Kersengaarde 188
NL-2272 NN Voorburg / NL
04 / VAN POMEREN, Frank, Pieter
J. Campertlaan 37
NL-2624 NZ Delft / NL
05 / VAN TILBURG, Johan
Plataanhout 64
NL-2719 KK Zoetermeer / NL
[1999/07]
Representative(s)Klein, Bart , et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Postbus 95321
2509 CH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]Klein, Bart , et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321
2509 CH The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date97921760.123.04.1997
[1999/07]
WO1997EP02123
Priority number, dateWO1996EP0173926.04.1996         Original published format: PCT/EP96/01739
EP1996020296724.10.1996         Original published format: EP 96202967
[1999/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9741530
Date:06.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0896705
Date:17.02.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997
[1999/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0896705
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033, G06K11/18
[1999/11]
Former International [1999/07]G06K11/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/07]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPIELEN ÜBER EIN NETZWERK UND EIN SPIELSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZWERKES[1999/07]
English:DEVICE FOR PLAYING GAMES VIA A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, AND A GAMES SYSTEM USING A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK[1999/07]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE JOUER A DES JEUX PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTEME DE JEU UTILISANT UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION[1999/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1998National basic fee paid 
26.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/07]
10.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1999Fee for grant paid
27.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
LU23.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2007/29]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
LU23.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2004/07]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2003/46]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2002/27]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2001/50]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
IE24.04.2000
Former [2001/29]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
FI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5236199  (THOMPSON JR JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]GB2192342  (COUNTRYWIDE COMPETITIONS LIMIT) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 116 - page 3, line 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE4228071  (HOFMANN BACH & PARTNER WERBE U [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 47; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0602840  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 10 - line 40; figures 1-4,7 *;
 [A]US4786768  (LANGEWIS CORNELIS [US], et al) [A] 3,10 * column 2, line 23 - line 64; figures 1,3 *;
 [PX]JPH08179742
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960712), vol. 96, no. 11, [PX] 1 * abstract *