Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904240

EP0904240 - CONTAINER LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMPAC VERPACKUNGS GMBH
Hollefeldstrasse 34
48282 Emsdetten / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Empac Verpackungs GmbH
Hollefeldstrasse 34
48282 Emsdetten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TREPTE, Peter
Droste-Hüllshoff-Allee 60
D-48282 Emsdetten / DE
02 / LÜTTGENS, Günter
Am Berg 27
D-51519 Odenthal / DE
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Pott, Ulrich , et al
Patentanwälte Busse & Busse Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Pott, Ulrich , et al
Patentanwälte Busse & Busse, Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
Application number, filing date97921814.628.04.1997
[1999/13]
WO1997EP02189
Priority number, dateDE199611790203.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19617902
[1999/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9742103
Date:13.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0904240
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997
[1999/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904240
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65D90/46
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1999/13]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERINLINER[1999/13]
English:CONTAINER LINER[1999/13]
French:REVETEMENT INTERIEUR POUR RECIPIENT[1999/13]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1998National basic fee paid 
01.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/13]
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1999Fee for grant paid
16.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0699599  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6-8,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4309832  (EMPAC VERPACKUNGS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *