EP0956952 - CLEANING APPARATUS AND CLEANING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARASHINA, Eigo Yoda Haitsu 312, 259-1, Miyabara-cho Kofu-shi, Yamanashi 400 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Ken 638-4, Kasei, Showa-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 409-38 / JP | 03 /
MASUI, Masuo 1332-2, Ryuoshinmachi, Ryuo-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 400-01 / JP | 04 /
NAITO, Takao 948-8, Shimosanjo, Tamaho-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 409-38 / JP | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922192.6 | 26.05.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997JP01784 | Priority number, date | JP19960132913 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13291396 | [1999/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745268 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956952 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956952 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H05K3/1233 (EP,US);
B41F35/00 (KR);
B41F35/005 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0139 (EP,US);
H05K3/1216 (EP,US);
H05K3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reinigen | [2001/33] | English: | CLEANING APPARATUS AND CLEANING METHOD | [1999/46] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE | [1999/46] |
Former [1999/46] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KEINIGEN | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1998 | Translation filed | 12.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05229108 ; | [YA]EP0341212 (TYPOFOT AG [CH]) [Y] 1,3 * see abstract; column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 65; figures 1-6; claims 1-5 * [A] 2,4; | [A]EP0680247 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5491871 (REBER DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931214), vol. 17, no. 679, Database accession no. (M - 1527), & JP05229108 A 19930907 (HITACHI TECHNO ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH05229109 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0671868 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPH06238866 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0834111 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |