Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0957773 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0957773



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 5961
06.06.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.05.2019 Matter concerning the application Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Annex Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
18.04.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
18.04.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
21.03.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.03.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.03.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.03.2019 Decision Opposition 1
07.03.2019 Decision Opposition 1
07.03.2019 Decision Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
26.01.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 1
29.11.2017 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
08.09.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.07.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.08.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 2
20.07.2016 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 3
20.07.2016 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 3
12.07.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
12.07.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
20.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
16.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
22.12.2014 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
22.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.12.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 34
15.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 27
04.12.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
01.12.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
11.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.08.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 34
05.08.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
05.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 36
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
23.07.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
20.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
13.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
12.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
01.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.03.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
27.03.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.03.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
14.03.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 36
14.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 99
14.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.12.2013 General authorisation Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.12.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
11.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.12.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
02.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
29.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
28.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
27.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.11.2013 Annex Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 23
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 15
18.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.11.2013 Claims Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
15.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
15.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 112
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
15.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Claims Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2013 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
06.11.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
02.11.2013 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
01.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
01.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
30.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Annex Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
17.10.2013 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 3
16.10.2013 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 2
16.10.2013 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 4
15.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.10.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.10.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2013 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.10.2013 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
17.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 5
13.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
13.09.2013 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
12.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
11.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
11.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
09.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
06.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
06.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.09.2013 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 7
04.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2013 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
29.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
26.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
26.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 12
20.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.08.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
16.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
14.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
14.08.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 30
07.08.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 6
07.08.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 5
07.08.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2013 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
06.08.2013 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
06.08.2013 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
02.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2013 General enquiry Opposition 1
07.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 135
07.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 135
26.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
26.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.04.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
25.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
11.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 68
22.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.02.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 37
22.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.12.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.12.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 65
13.12.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
24.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
11.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.10.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
05.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 118
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 90
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
28.09.2012 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
06.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
25.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Communication about exclusion of parts of the file from file inspection Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Communication about exclusion of parts of the file from file inspection Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Communication about exclusion of parts of the file from file inspection Opposition 1
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 26
17.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.04.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.04.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.04.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 26
13.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
13.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
16.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
08.03.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 68
08.03.2012 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
08.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
08.03.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 41
08.03.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.03.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 41
08.03.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.03.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
20.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.06.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.06.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.05.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
12.05.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.05.2011 New German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.05.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 New German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.05.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.05.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.05.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.05.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.05.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
13.04.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
13.04.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
05.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
05.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.03.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
16.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
16.03.2011 Description Search / examination 3
16.03.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.01.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 49
27.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
26.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
06.02.2009 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
05.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
05.02.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
30.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
30.01.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.09.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.02.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
11.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
11.02.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
11.02.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.01.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
17.12.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.08.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.08.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2007 Description Search / examination 5
26.03.2007 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
20.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.03.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
02.02.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
26.01.2001 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
13.10.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.02.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 3
28.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
28.11.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.11.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.09.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.06.1998 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
26.06.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
16.01.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.11.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.11.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 66
20.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 68