EP1009576 - GAS LENS ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TWECO PRODUCTS, INC 4200 W. Harry Wichita Kansas 67277 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states TWECO PRODUCTS, INC 4200 W. Harry Wichita Kansas 67277 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEW, Kent M. Tweco Products, Inc., 4200 W. Harry Wichita, KS 67277 / US | 02 /
MOFIELD, William O. Tweco Products, Inc., 4200 W. Harry Wichita, KS 67277 / US | 03 /
BERVIG, Dale R. Tweco Products, Inc., 4200 W. Harry Wichita, KS 67277 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922329.4 | 17.04.1997 | [2000/25] | WO1997US06364 | Priority number, date | US19960634796 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: US 634796 | US19970788773 | 24.01.1997 Original published format: US 788773 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9739852 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1009576 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/16, B23K9/173 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B23K9/173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/25] | Title | German: | GASLINSEZUSAMMENBAU | [2000/25] | English: | GAS LENS ASSEMBLY | [2000/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE LENTILLES A GAZ | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 26.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]US5556550 (FYFFE STEVE [US]) [YP] 1-6,8,12 * column 2, line 22 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3053968 (GORMAN EUGENE F, et al) [Y] 1-6,8,12 * column 4, line 52 - line 60; figure 1A * | International search | [X]US5556550 (FYFFE STEVE [US]); | [Y]US3053968 (GORMAN EUGENE F, et al); | [Y]US3436516 (SWIFT MICHAEL W); | [A]US3180967 (HILL CLIFFORD W); | [Y]US5484973 (GITTENS TIMOTHY E [US], et al) |