Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969747

EP0969747 - COLOR STABLE IRON FORTIFIED DRY DRINK MIXES, READY-TO-DRINK BEVERAGES AND FOODS OTHER THAN BEVERAGES THAT OPTIONALLY CONTAIN ZINC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HENRY, William, John, Jr.
5428 Bayberry Court
Taylor Mill, KY 41015 / US
02 / XI, Xiaobing
5427 Senour Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
03 / FAVRE, Michel, Lucien, Hubert, Lannelongue
11969 Carrington Court
Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US
04 / MEHANSHO, Haile
7 Highknoll Court
Fairfield, OH 45014 / US
05 / MELLICAN, Renee, Irvine
72 Towne Commons Way 35
Woodlawn, OH 45215 / US
06 / LI, Jianjun
6464 Tylers Crossing
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2006/34]Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/02]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97922513.329.04.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US07105
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848648
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969747
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969747
Date:24.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/385, A23L2/39, A23L2/58, A23L2/56, A23L2/68, A23L1/302, A23L1/304
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:FARBSTABILE MIT EISEN ANGEREICHERTE TROCKENE GETRÄNKEMISCHUNGEN,TRINKFERTIGE GETRÄNKE UND ANDERE NAHRUNGSMITTEL ALS GETRÄNKE DIE GEGEBENENFALLS ZINK ENTHALTEN[2009/04]
English:COLOR STABLE IRON FORTIFIED DRY DRINK MIXES, READY-TO-DRINK BEVERAGES AND FOODS OTHER THAN BEVERAGES THAT OPTIONALLY CONTAIN ZINC[2000/02]
French:PREPARATIONS SECHES POUR BOISSONS, BOISSONS PRETES A BOIRE ET ALIMENTS AUTRES QUE BOISSONS FORTIFIES AVEC DU FER, DE COULEUR STABLE, ET CONTENANT EVENTUELLEMENT DU ZINC[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]FARBESTABIELE MITT EISEN ANGREICHETE TROCKENE GETRÄNKEMISCHUNGEN,TRINKFERTIGE GETRANKEN UND NICHT-GETRÄNKE NAHRUNGSMITTELN DIE GEGEBENEFALLS ZINK ENTHALTEN
Entry into regional phase20.07.1999National basic fee paid 
20.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2009Fee for grant paid
30.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination05.11.2004Appeal received No.  T0176/05
27.12.2004Statement of grounds filed
06.11.2006Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
06.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)25.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.06.1999AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
22.06.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.06.1999M01   Fee paid on   20.07.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.06.2009
BE24.06.2009
DK24.06.2009
FI24.06.2009
NL24.06.2009
SE24.09.2009
GR25.09.2009
PT24.10.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT24.06.2009
BE24.06.2009
DK24.06.2009
FI24.06.2009
NL24.06.2009
SE24.09.2009
PT24.10.2009
Former [2010/19]AT24.06.2009
BE24.06.2009
FI24.06.2009
NL24.06.2009
SE24.09.2009
PT24.10.2009
Former [2010/05]AT24.06.2009
FI24.06.2009
SE24.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9415482  (ALBION INT [US]) [A] 1,12,20,30,40 * page 6, lines 17-28; claim - *;
 [A]EP0297681  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,12,20,30,40 * claim - *;
 [A]GB2212396  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,12,20,30,40 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9408473  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,12,20,30,40 * claim - *;
 [E]WO9715201  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-11 * claim - *
by applicantUS4684528
 US4786578
 WO9715201
 US4789510
 US4786518
 US4822847