Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0897462

EP0897462 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE SOOT CONTENT OF DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GASES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
45764 Marl / DE
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
Degussa Aktiengesellschaft
Weissfrauenstrasse 9
60311 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PETERS, Norbert
Templergraben 64
D-52056 Aachen / DE
02 / BORN, Caroline
Templergraben 37
D-52056 Aachen / DE
03 / ANTONI, Christian
Vaalser Strasse 291
D-52056 Aachen / DE
04 / PLESSING, Tobias
Bachstrasse 36
D-52056 Aachen / DE
[1999/08]
Application number, filing date97922943.202.05.1997
[1999/08]
WO1997EP02253
Priority number, dateDE199611788504.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19617885
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9742405
Date:13.11.1997
Language:DE
[1997/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0897462
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997
[1999/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0897462
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:F02B3/06, F02B47/00, F02B51/00
[1999/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES RUSSGEHALTS IM ABGAS EINES DIESELMOTORS UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS[1999/08]
English:PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE SOOT CONTENT OF DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GASES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING IT[1999/08]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA TENEUR EN SUIES DANS LES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF APPROPRIE POUR METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE[1999/08]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1998National basic fee paid 
09.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/08]
25.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1601339  (SCHEIBER DR WERNER) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2406723  (MELLQVIST ALLAN [SE]) [A] 1,4 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]WO9413941  (HIGH SPEED TECH LTD OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4422552  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 9 * the whole document *