Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0914684 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0914684



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 111
04.12.1997 Priority document Search / examination 14
04.12.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
04.12.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
02.02.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.02.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
16.11.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
16.11.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.11.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.11.1998 Description Search / examination 8
16.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
16.11.1998 Annex Search / examination 4
16.11.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
29.03.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
28.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
21.07.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
20.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1