blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0914684 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0914684



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 111
28.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
21.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.07.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
21.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
29.03.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.03.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.11.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.11.1998 Annex Search / examination 4
16.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
16.11.1998 Description Search / examination 8
16.11.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.11.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.11.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
03.02.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
02.02.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
04.12.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
04.12.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
04.12.1997 Priority document Search / examination 14