blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0914684


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
11.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
29.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.1999 First examination report
23.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.06.1999 Renewal fee
09.04.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
26.03.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.05.1999 [1999/19]
26.03.1999 Request for examination filed published on  12.05.1999 [1999/19]
19.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
02.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.1997 PCT data prior to European publication