blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0914684
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3974183BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2007B2
JP2000511683 05.09.2000A
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0914684Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0914684 12.05.1999A1
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT189340T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU711543B 14.10.1999B2
AU2916297 05.01.1998A
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2255775 04.12.2007C
CA2255775 04.12.1997A1
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69701229D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69701229T 06.07.2000T2
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0914684T 10.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6217812 17.04.2001B1
Priority number Date
NL9700301 29.05.1997
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9745886Global Dossier 04.12.1997A1
Priority number Date
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2144313T 01.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100452239B 15.01.2005B1
KR20000016061 25.03.2000A
Priority number Date
NL1003238 30.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL1003238C 03.12.1997C2
Priority number Date
NL1003238 30.05.1996