Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914684

EP0914684 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLATE-SHAPED COMPONENTS OR COMBINATIONS OF COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stichting Energieonderzoek Centrum Nederland
Westerduinweg 3, P.O.Box 1
1755 LE Petten / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
Stichting Energieonderzoek Centrum Nederland(ECN)
Westerduinweg 3, P.O.Box 1
1755 LE Petten / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE ROOIJ, Robert
Montgomerystraat 11
NL-1931 VW Egmond aan Zee / NL
02 / NAMMENSMA, Pieter
Saturnuslaan 36
NL-1702 BC Heerhugowaard / NL
[1999/19]
Representative(s)de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date97923340.029.05.1997
[1999/19]
WO1997NL00301
Priority number, dateNL1996100323830.05.1996         Original published format: NL 1003238
[1999/19]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9745886
Date:04.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0914684
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997
[1999/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914684
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, H01M4/88, C04B35/624, B22F3/22
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN BAUTEILEN ODER BAUTEILKOMBINATIONEN[1999/19]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLATE-SHAPED COMPONENTS OR COMBINATIONS OF COMPONENTS[1999/19]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES COMPOSANTS EN FORME DE PLAQUES OU DES COMBINAISONS DESDITS COMPOSANTS[1999/19]
Entry into regional phase29.05.1997Translation filed 
16.11.1998National basic fee paid 
16.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/19]
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.1999Fee for grant paid
20.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.03.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.03.1999
25.03.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.03.1999
25.03.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.03.1999
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9608050  (STICHTING ENERGIE ;SITTERS ERIC FRANCISCUS (NL); HEUVELN FREDERIK) [DA] 1,3,4,6,12 * page 5, line 3 - line 21 *;
 [A]EP0231863  (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 3; claim 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE4030945  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * column 5, line 27 - line 50; claims 3,6,7 *;
 [A]EP0509424  (INST GAS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 8,9 * column 6, line 51 - line 57; claim 37 *;
 JPS6343266  [ ] (FUJI ELECTRIC CORPORATE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT);
 [A]DE2829901  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4581302  (VINE RAYMOND W ET AL);
 [A]EP0661767  (FINMECCANICA SPA) [A] * claim 1 *
 [A]  - KOSEKI ET AL, "Manufacture of electrolyte plates for molten-carbonate fuel cells", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880627), vol. 108, no. 26, Database accession no. 224300, XP002024531 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - BOHME O ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF MATERIALS AND PRODUCTION TECHNOLOGIES FOR MOLTEN CARBONATE FUEL CELLS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (19940401), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 349 - 355, XP000434932

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3199(94)90067-1