Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0925023

EP0925023 - ACOUSTIC MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE ARMY
Headquarters, Departement of the Army, The Pentagon
Washington, DC 20310 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE ARMY
Headquarters, Departement of the Army, The Pentagon
Washington, DC 20310 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCANLON, Michael, V.
13123 Buccaneer Road
Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/39]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [1999/26]Deans, Michael John Percy , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date97923446.529.04.1997
[1999/26]
WO1997US06804
Priority number, dateUS1996064313902.05.1996         Original published format: US 643139
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9740748
Date:06.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0925023
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997
[1999/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/00
[1999/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/26]
TitleGerman:AKUSTISCHES UBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[1999/26]
English:ACOUSTIC MONITORING SYSTEM[1999/26]
French:SYSTEME DE CONTROLE ACOUSTIQUE[1999/26]
Entry into regional phase02.12.1998National basic fee paid 
02.12.1998Search fee paid 
02.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/26]
01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/20]
09.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9214400  (PRISM IMAGING INC [US]) [X] 1-4,10,18,27,35,41 * page 8, line 5 - line 27 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 36 * * page 15, line 8 - line 29 * [A] 5,7,17;
 [XA]US4299233  (LEMELSON JEROME H) [X] 5,17-19,33,35,38,41 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 4 * * column 5, line 29 - line 54 * [A] 1,2,7,10;
 [A]EP0514744  (SHTALRYD HAIM [IL], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,10,41 * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 9 *
International search[X]US4407293  (SUAREZ JR JOE R [US], et al);
 [X]US4722346  (CHEN JAMES N [US])
by applicantUS4862144