EP0904143 - FLUTED FILTER MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Wayne, M. 120 Redwood Drive Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 02 /
GILLINGHAM, Gary, R. 17305 Flemming Lane Prior Lake, MN 55372 / US | 03 /
TOKAR, Joseph, C. 6205 137th Street Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 04 /
RISCH, Daniel, T. 1116 136th Street West Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | 05 /
ROTHMAN, Jim, C. 332 Riverwoods Lane Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | 06 /
WAHLQUIST, Fred, H. 8444 11th Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420 / US | 07 /
MATTHYS, Bernard, A. 204 Strese Lane Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 08 /
SABELKO, Stephen, W. 750 Laura Street Prescott, WI 54021 / US | 09 /
PATTEN, Bryan, D. 9624 10th Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420 / US | 10 /
REICHTER, Gregory, L. 10617 Hopkins Road Bloomington, MN 55420 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97923469.7 | 25.04.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US07050 | Priority number, date | US19960639220 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 639220 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740918 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904143 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904143 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/12, B01D46/52, B01D25/24 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D39/00 (KR);
B01D25/001 (EP,US);
B01D25/24 (EP,US);
B01D25/26 (EP,US);
B01D25/30 (EP,US);
B01D25/305 (EP,US);
B01D46/0095 (EP,US);
B01D46/0097 (KR);
B01D46/525 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2201/44 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (KR);
B01D2271/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1016 (EP,US);
Y10T156/102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | GEFALTETES FILTERMATERIAL | [1999/13] | English: | FLUTED FILTER MEDIA | [1999/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRAGE COMPORTANT DES CANNELURES | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2003 | BE | 18.06.2003 | CH | 18.06.2003 | FI | 18.06.2003 | LI | 18.06.2003 | NL | 18.06.2003 | DK | 18.09.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 18.06.2003 | |
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 18.06.2003 | |
LI | 18.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2599604 (BAUER JORDAN V, et al) [A] 1,15-17,23,28-32* the whole document *; | [A]US3025963 (BAUER JORDAN V) [A] 1,15-17,23,28-32,34-37 * the whole document *; | [X]US4310419 (NARA AKIO, et al) [X] 1-11,14,18-22,24-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US4589983 (WYDEVAN ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1-3,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4652286 (KUSUDA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0630672 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-11,14,18-22,24-26 * the whole document * |