EP0898470 - HIP JOINT GLENOID CAVITY WITH A SPECIAL THREAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmansdörfer, Gerd Kastanieneck 6 A D-31303 Burgdorf / DE | [1999/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/09] | Application number, filing date | 97923740.1 | 21.04.1997 | [1999/09] | WO1997DE00793 | Priority number, date | DE1996115876 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19615876 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739702 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898470 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0898470 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34 | [1999/09] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | HÜFTGELENKPFANNE MIT SPEZIALGEWINDE | [1999/09] | English: | HIP JOINT GLENOID CAVITY WITH A SPECIAL THREAD | [1999/09] | French: | CAVITE GLENOIDE DE L'ARTICULATION DE LA HANCHE AVEC UN FILET SPECIAL | [1999/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8500284 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3535959 (ORTHOPLANT ENDOPROTHETIK) [Y] 2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0237751 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [AD]DE3701381 (ORTHOPLANT ENDOPROTHETIK) [AD] 4 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0358345 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 7 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3840468 (LIEKE MICHAEL [DE]); | [A]EP0586335 (SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [A] 3 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE9408200U (KERAMED MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * page 5, line 35 - line 37 *; | [A]WO9515132 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [YDA]WO9518586 (HOERMANSDOERFER GERD [DE]) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5,7; | [Y]EP0667134 (HERMANN WERNER [CH]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4408527 (HOERMANSDOERFER GERD [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |