Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910261

EP0910261 - ROW OF SEATS PROVIDED WITH CABLE OR DUCT GUIDING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chataignier, Bernard
26, rue Victor Basch
94360 Bry-sur-Marne / FR
For all designated states
Bujon, Daniel
25, avenue des Coquelicots
93370 Montfermeil / FR
[1999/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Le Forestier, Eric
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Le Forestier, Eric
Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97924071.009.05.1997
[1999/17]
WO1997FR00832
Priority number, dateFR1996000579209.05.1996         Original published format: FR 9605792
[1999/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9742858
Date:20.11.1997
Language:FR
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0910261
Date:28.04.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910261
Date:21.03.2001
Language:FR
[2001/12]
Search report(s)International search reportEP20.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/12, A47C7/72
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/17]
Extension statesRO09.12.1998
TitleGerman:STUHLREIHE MIT KABEL- ODER KANALFÜHRUNGEN[1999/17]
English:ROW OF SEATS PROVIDED WITH CABLE OR DUCT GUIDING MEANS[1999/17]
French:RANGEE DE SIEGES EQUIPES DE MOYENS DE PASSAGE DE CABLES OU CONDUITS[1999/17]
Entry into regional phase07.12.1998National basic fee paid 
07.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
23.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2000Fee for grant paid
11.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.03.2001
LU09.05.2001
DK21.06.2001
SE21.06.2001
[2004/39]
Former [2003/46]FI21.03.2001
DK21.06.2001
SE21.06.2001
Former [2002/12]FI21.03.2001
SE21.06.2001
Former [2002/05]SE21.06.2001
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2357211  (CASTELLI SAS ANONIMA [IT]) [DA] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4255610  (TEXTORIS MELVIN A) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 1-12; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0278923  (CANALPLAST SRL [IT]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,14,15 *