Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0925387

EP0925387 - ANODE WITH ENHANCED DURABILITY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE
Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National
2, rue Louis Murat
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / REID, Véronique
8, avenue du Général Leclerc
F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR
02 / LECLERC, Olivier
4, rue des Petits Chaumes
F-77250 Moret sur Loing / FR
03 / MANOLI, Georgia
35, rue Béranger
F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR
04 / CARDARELLI, François
Appartement 28,26, rue A. Rambaud
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
05 / SAVALL, André
42, boulevard des Pyrénées
F-31170 Toulouse / FR
06 / COMNINELLIS, Christos
Les Esserts
CH-1031 Mex / CH
07 / TAXIL, Pierre
10, rue Paul Codos
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
[2000/38]
Former [1999/26]01 / REID, Véronique
8, avenue du Général Leclerc
F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR
02 / LECLERC, Olivier
4, rue des Petits Chaumes
F-77250 Moret sur Loing / FR
03 / MANOLI, Georgia
35, rue Béranger
F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR
04 / CARDARELLI, François
Appartement 28,m6, rue A. Rambaud
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
05 / SAVALL, André
42, boulevard des Pyrénées
F-31170 Toulouse / FR
06 / COMNINELLIS, Christos
Les Esserts
CH-1031 Mex / CH
07 / TAXIL, Pierre
10, rue Paul Codos
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
Representative(s)Boulinguiez, Didier
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Boulinguiez, Didier
Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date97924074.412.05.1997
[1999/26]
WO1997FR00836
Priority number, dateFR1996000591613.05.1996         Original published format: FR 9605916
[1999/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9743465
Date:20.11.1997
Language:FR
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0925387
Date:30.06.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997
[1999/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0925387
Date:20.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:C25B11/10
[1999/26]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1999/26]
TitleGerman:ANODE MIT VERBESSERTER LEBENSDAUER UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1999/26]
English:ANODE WITH ENHANCED DURABILITY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME[1999/26]
French:ANODE A LONGEVITE AMELIOREE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/26]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1998National basic fee paid 
02.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/26]
18.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2000Fee for grant paid
13.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.05.2001
CH11.06.2001
LI11.06.2001
[2015/21]
Former [2002/29]BE31.05.2001
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0383470  (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-12 * column 7, line 43 - line 58 * * column 8; example 1 * * column 11 - column 12; claims 1-7 *;
 [Y]EP0384194  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 5 - column 6; example 2 *;
 [A]US4257856  (BENI GERARDO, et al) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 5; example 1 *;
 [A]JPH0533177
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 11, Database accession no. 93-089086, XP002022091 & JPH0533177 A 19930209 (DAISO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *