EP0909134 - HAIR TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/16] | HAIR TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[2003/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Benedictis, Alfredo 30 Falcon Avenue Springfield Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK6 3HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states De Benedictis, Alfredo 30 Falcon Avenue Springfield Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK6 3HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 4 Saxon Court Freeschool Street Northampton, Northants NN1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [2001/23] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO, 114/118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1999/16] | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick Redhill Rushden Buntingford, Herts. SG9 0TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925167.5 | 06.06.1997 | [1999/16] | WO1997GB01540 | Priority number, date | GB19960011816 | 06.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9611816 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746132 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909134 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909134 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/02 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
A45D2/08 (EP,US);
A45D2/02 (KR);
A45D2/10 (EP,US);
A45D2002/008 (EP,US);
A45D2002/025 (EP,US);
A45D7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/16] | Title | German: | HAARBEHANDLUNGVERFAHREN | [2003/02] | English: | HAIR TREATMENT METHOD | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES CHEVEUX | [2003/02] |
Former [1999/16] | HAARBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [1999/16] | HAIR TREATMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
Former [1999/16] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES CHEVEUX | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03015581.6 / EP1360913 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1999 | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2002 | 30.06.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2003 | BE | 29.10.2003 | CH | 29.10.2003 | LI | 29.10.2003 | NL | 29.10.2003 | DK | 29.01.2004 | GR | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | IE | 07.06.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
BE | 29.10.2003 | ||
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
IE | 07.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
BE | 29.10.2003 | ||
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1393448 (ADOLF KIETZ) [A] 1,3,4,8,9* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2781047 (WHITEHILL ALBERT J) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * page 2, line 65 - page 5, line 53; figure - *; | [A]US2962031 (BUMGARNER FRANCES V) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * figure - *; | [A]GB1043315 (GILLETTE CO) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * page 2, line 55 - page 5, line 122; figure - *; | [XD]WO9522920 (BENEDICTIS ALFREDO DE [GB]) [XD] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * |