Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918751

EP0918751 - PROCESS FOR THE DEALKYLATING SULFONATION OF P-ALKYL CALIXARENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/22]PROCESS FOR THE DEALKYLATING SULFONATION OF $i(P)-ALKYL CALIXARENES
[1999/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2001
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Transdiffusia S.A.
7, avenue Krieg
1208 Genève / CH
[1999/22]
Inventor(s)01 / LAMARTINE, Roger
166, avenue Roger Salengro
F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR
02 / REGNOUF DE VAINS, Jean-Bernard
9, rue du Lac
F-69003 Lyon / FR
03 / CHOQUARD, Philippe
Chemin de la Gradelle 23
CH-1223 Cologny / CH
04 / MARCILLAC, Arnold
3, rue du Port
F-01150 St. Sorlin en Bugey / FR
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Mohnhaupt, Dietrich , et al
IPTO S.A.
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Mohnhaupt, Dietrich , et al
IPTO S.A., Route de la Fonderie 8
1705 Fribourg / CH
Application number, filing date97925238.424.06.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997IB00769
Priority number, dateUS1996067117026.06.1996         Original published format: US 671170
[1999/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9749677
Date:31.12.1997
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0918751
Date:02.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918751
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C303/02, C07C309/43
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DEALKYLIERENDEN SULFONIERUNG VON P-ALKYL-CALIXARENEN[1999/22]
English:PROCESS FOR THE DEALKYLATING SULFONATION OF P-ALKYL CALIXARENES[1999/52]
French:PROCEDE DE DESALKYLATION ET DE SULFONATION DES CALIXARENES P-ALKYL[1999/52]
Former [1999/22]PROCESS FOR THE DEALKYLATING SULFONATION OF $i(P)-ALKYL CALIXARENES
Former [1999/22]PROCEDE DE DESALKYLATION ET DE SULFONATION DES CALIXARENES $i(p)-ALKYL
Entry into regional phase14.12.1998National basic fee paid 
14.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/22]
21.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.06.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2000Fee for grant paid
26.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE27.12.2000
LU24.06.2001
IE25.06.2001
[2004/39]
Former [2002/48]SE27.12.2000
IE25.06.2001
Former [2002/23]SE27.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9212708  (GENELABS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * see figures 8 and 9A, page 22, lines 22-31, and page 51, example 2A *;
 [X]  - S. SHINKAI ET AL., "New synthesis of calixarene-p-sulphonates and p-nitrocalixarenes", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS I, LONDON, GB, (198711), no. 11, pages 2297 - 9, XP002038859 [X] 9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19870002297
 [X]  - J.W. STEED ET AL., "Supramolecular chemistry of p-sulfonatocalix[5]arene: a water-soluble, bowl-shaped host with a large molecular cavity", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19951122), vol. 117, no. 46, pages 11426 - 33, XP002038860 [X] 1-9 * see page 11427, left-hand column, preparation of 1b, first step *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00151a006
 [A]  - H.J.A. LAMBRECHTS ET AL., "Aromatic sulphonation. Part 93. Sulphonation of the three t-butylphenols, four di-t-butylphenols, and 2,4,6-tri-t-butylphenol", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS II, LONDON, GB, (198505), no. 5, pages 677 - 82, XP002038861 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29850000677