Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990368

EP0990368 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FREQUENCY-DOMAIN DOWNMIXING WITH BLOCK-SWITCH FORCING FOR AUDIO DECODING FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Asia Pacific Pte Ltd.
28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2
Singapore 569508 / SG
[2001/51]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SGS-Thomson Microelectronics Asia Pacific (PTE) Ltd
28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2
Singapore 569508 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / ALVAREZ-TINOCO, Antonio, Mario
32 Toh Tuck Road 03-01
Singapore 596710 / SG
02 / GEORGE, Sapna
Block 315, 2 Serangoon Avenue 06-220
Singapore 550315 / SG
03 / YANG, Haiyun
Block 506, 5 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 11-2628
Singapore 560506 / SG
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Cerbaro, Elena , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date97925384.608.05.1997
[2000/14]
WO1997SG00020
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851126
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990368
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990368
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04S1/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR FREQUENZDOMÄNEABWÄRTSUMSETZUNG MIT ZWANGBLOCKSCHALTUNG FÜR AUDIODEKODERFUNKTIONEN[2000/14]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FREQUENCY-DOMAIN DOWNMIXING WITH BLOCK-SWITCH FORCING FOR AUDIO DECODING FUNCTIONS[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ABAISSEMENT DU DOMAINE FREQUENTIEL A FORCAGE DE COMMUTATION DE BLOCS POUR FONCTIONS DE DECODAGE AUDIO[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase06.12.1999National basic fee paid 
06.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
05.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2002Fee for grant paid
29.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0697665  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-12 * page 2, lines 5-26 * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, lines 32-43 * * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 8 * * page 9, lines 35-51 * * page 9, line 55 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10, lines 8-16 * * page 10, lines 27-37 * * figure 10 * [A] 6,7,13,14;
 [A]US5321729  (SCHROEDER ERNST [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, lines 35-67 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, lines 21-37 *;
 [A]JPH06165079  ;
 [A]WO9009064  (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,8-12 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 15 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 1 * * page 13, lines 7-13 * * page 30, line 12 - page 38, line 21 * * page 39, lines 16-30 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940912), vol. 18, no. 488, Database accession no. (E - 1605), [A] 1,8 * abstract *