Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980409

EP0980409 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS THAT ARE REMOVABLE AFTER THERMOSETTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WAID, Robert, D.
2983 Granada Lane North
Oakdale, MN 55128 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2000/08]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97925450.505.05.1997
[2000/08]
WO1997US07505
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850480
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980409
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09J163/00, C09J133/06
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/08]
TitleGerman:NACH HITZEHÄRTUNG ABNEHMBARE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/08]
English:ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS THAT ARE REMOVABLE AFTER THERMOSETTING[2000/08]
French:COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES ENLEVABLES APRES THERMODURCISSEMENT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
27.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0101964  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 21 - page 7, line 22; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0454365  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 7, line 35; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US4968562  (DELGADO JOAQUIN [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 39 - column 8, line 32; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US4556591  (BANNINK JR ENGBERT T [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - column 5, line 25 *;
 [A]GB2002790  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [D]US4166152  (BAKER WILLIAM A [US], et al);
 [DA]US3765972  (WESP G) [DA] 1 * column W *