Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990141

EP0990141 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTANCE MEASUREMENTS WITH SOLID-STATE NMR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Curagen Corporation
555 Long Wharf Drive
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / JARVIE, Thomas, P.
107 Training Hill Road
Middletown, CT 06457 / US
02 / BADER, Joel, S.
Apartment 4E, 85 South Main Street
Branford, CT 06405 / US
03 / WENT, Gregory, T.
25 Scotland Avenue
Madison, CT 06443 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Senior, Janet , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Senior, Janet , et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Former [2000/14]Adams, Nicola , et al
Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97925527.012.05.1997
[2000/14]
WO1997US08004
Priority number, dateUS1996064860915.05.1996         Original published format: US 648609
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9743627
Date:20.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990141
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N24/12, G01N33/53, G06F19/00, G06F159/00, G01R33/46
[2001/29]
Former International [2000/14]G01N24/12, G01N33/53, G06F19/00, G06F159/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABSTANDSMESSUNG MIT NMR IN FESTKÖRPERN[2000/14]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISTANCE MEASUREMENTS WITH SOLID-STATE NMR[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES MESURES DE DISTANCES SUR DES SUBSTANCES A L'ETAT SOLIDE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE NUCLEAIRE (RMN)[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase09.12.1998National basic fee paid 
09.12.1998Search fee paid 
09.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/14]
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
09.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXY]  VAN ECK E R H ET AL, "A solid-state NMR 3D heteronuclear dipolar-correlation experiment. The correlation of delta (/sup 13/C), delta (/sup 15/N) and D/sub (C-N/)", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, SERIES A, AUG. 1994, USA, vol. 109, no. 2, ISSN 1064-1858, pages 250 - 252, XP002167986 [DX] 1-7 * see the whole document * [Y] 8,10-17,19,20,22,23,27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmra.1994.1163
 [DXA]  HING A W ET AL, "Transferred-echo double-resonance NMR", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, JAN. 1992, USA, vol. 96, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2364, pages 205 - 209, XP002167987 [DX] 1-7 * see the whole document * [A] 20,26,30
 [Y]  ROBIN M ET AL, "Optimized acquisition and processing schemes in three-dimensional NMR spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, MAY 1991, USA, vol. 92, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2364, pages 645 - 650, XP002167989 [Y] 8,10-17,19,20,22,23,27 * see the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2364(91)90364-Y
 [A]  J.SCHAEFER, "REDOR & TEDOR", IN: ENCYCLOPEDIA OF NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE, D.M.GRANT AND R.K.HARRIS (EDS.), JOHN WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER, (199603), XP002168386 [A] 1-30 * see the whole document; page 3977 - page 3984 *
International search[A]  - JARVIE T P, WENT G T, MUELLER K T, "SIMULTANEOUS MULTIPLE DISTANCE MEASUREMENTS IN PEPTIDES VIA SOLID-STATE NMR", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960101), vol. 118, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ja960188f, ISSN 0002-7863, page 5330/5331, XP002947430

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja960188f
 [A]  - MUELLER K T, ET AL., "THE REDOR TRANSFORM: DIRECT CALCULATION OF INTERNUCLEAR COUPLINGS FROM DIPOLAR-DEPHASING NMR DATA", Chemical Physics Letters, Elsevier BV, NL, NL, (19950901), vol. 242, doi:10.1016/0009-2614(95)00773-W, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 535 - 542, XP002947431

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-2614(95)00773-W
 [A]  - HING A W, ET AL., "AN IVESTIGATION OF THE LIGAND-BINDING SITE OF THE GLUTAMINE-BINDINGPROTEIN OF ESCHERICHIA COLI USING ROTATIONAL-ECHO DOUBLE-RESONANCE NMR", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19940101), vol. 33, no. 29, doi:10.1021/bi00195a005, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8651 - 8661, XP002947485

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00195a005