Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977595

EP0977595 - PREVENTION OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE WITH T-CELLS INCLUDING POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NEGATIVE SELECTIVE MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2001
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2002  [2002/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENETIC THERAPY, INC.
938 Clopper Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / MUNSHI, Nikhil
16 Bent Tree Drive
Little Rock, AR 72212 / US
02 / ENNIST, David, L.
9715 De Paul Drive
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
03 / JACOB, William, F.
20204 Tidewinds Way
Germantown, MD 20874 / US
04 / CHIANG, Yawen, L.
11423 Bedfordshire Avenue
Potomac, MD 20854 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Becker, Konrad , et al
Novartis AG
Corporate IP - Patent & Trademarks
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Becker, Konrad , et al
Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date97925747.428.05.1997
[2000/06]
WO1997US09040
Priority number, dateUS1996065645131.05.1996         Original published format: US 656451
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9745142
Date:04.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977595
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/85
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesRO18.12.1998
SI18.12.1998
TitleGerman:VERHÜTUNG VON TRANSPLANTAT/EMPFÄNGER KRANKHEITEN MITTELS T-ZELLEN, WELCHE POLYNUKLEINSÄUREN FÜR NEGATIVE SELEKTIONSMARKER BEINHALTEN[2000/06]
English:PREVENTION OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE WITH T-CELLS INCLUDING POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NEGATIVE SELECTIVE MARKERS[2000/06]
French:PREVENTION DE LA REACTION DU GREFFON CONTRE L'HOTE AU MOYEN DE LYMPHOCYTES THYMO-DEPENDANTS CONTENANT DES POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT DES MARQUEURS DE SELECTION NEGATIVE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase18.12.1998National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Search fee paid 
18.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/06]
14.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/04]
23.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - TIBERGIEN P ET AL, "GANCICLOVIR TREATMENT OF HERPES SIMPLEX THYMIDINE KINASE-TRANSDUCEDPRIMARY T LYMPHOCYTES: AN APPROACH FOR SPECIFIC IN VIVO DONOR T-CELL DEPLETION AFTER BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION?", BLOOD,US,W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, (19940815), vol. 84, no. 4, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1333 - 1341, XP000566470 [Y] 1-20 * see abstract, page 1334 right col. and page 1339 last paragraph *
 [Y]  - MULLEN C A, "Metabolic suicide genes in gene therapy.", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1994 AUG) 63 (2) 199-207. REF: 35, XP000566391 [Y] 1-20 * see abstract and page 200 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0163-7258(94)90046-9
International search[A]  - NIH OFFICE OF PUBLIC INFORMATION, 7 December 1995, ORKIN S.H. et al., "Report and Recommendations of the Panel to Assess the NIH Investment in Research on Gene Therapy", pages 1-40.
 [A]  - BLOOD, 01 August 1996, Vol. 88, No. 3, GALLOT G. et al., "Human HLA-Specific T-Cell Clones with Stable Expression of a Suicide Gene: A Possible Tool to Drive and Control a Graft-Versus-Host--Graft-Versus-Leukemia Reaction?", pages 1098-1103.
 [Y]  - BLOOD, 1994, Abstract 427, BONINI C. et al., "Transfer of the HSV-TK Gene Into Donor Peripheral Blood Lymphocytes for in Vivo Immunomodulation of Donor Anti-Tumor Immunity After Allo-BMT".
 [Y]  - BLOOD, November 1995, Abstract 843, SERVIDA P. et al., "Gene Transfer Into Peripheral Blood Lymphocytes for in Vivo Immunomodulation of Donor Anti-Tumor Immunity in a Patient Affected by EBV-Induced Lymphoma".