Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0850205

EP0850205 - METHOD FOR DISPOSING OF FIBRE CEMENT WASTE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FibreCem Holding AG
Eternitstrasse 3
8867 Niederurnen / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
ETERNIT AG
Eternitstrasse 3
CH-8867 Niederurnen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FETZ, Linus, B.
Altfeldweg 53
CH-5702 Niederlenz / CH
02 / CALUORI, André
Gassa sut(RTM) 52
CH-7013 Domat/Ems / CH
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date97925812.624.06.1997
[1998/27]
WO1997CH00248
Priority number, dateCH1996000177115.07.1996         Original published format: CH 177196
[1998/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9802392
Date:22.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0850205
Date:01.07.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998
[1998/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0850205
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:C04B7/24, A62D3/00
[1998/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [1998/27]
Extension statesSI06.03.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSORGUNG VON FASERZEMENTABFALLPRODUKTEN[1998/27]
English:METHOD FOR DISPOSING OF FIBRE CEMENT WASTE PRODUCTS[1998/27]
French:PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DES DECHETS EN FIBROCIMENT[1998/27]
Entry into regional phase06.03.1998National basic fee paid 
06.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
22.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2000Fee for grant paid
24.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0688742  (INST BAUSTOFF UND UMWELTSCHUTZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-3;
 [A]DE4444522  (WITEGA ANGEWANDTE WERKSTOFF FORSCHUNG GEMEINNUETZIGE GMBH ADLERSHOF [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [PA]DE19509706  (WITEGA ANGEWANDTE WERKSTOFF FORSCHUNG GEMEINNUETZIGE GMBH ADLERSHOF [DE]) [PA] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4330551  (RAMMENSEE WERNER PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3728787  (HIENDL HERIBERT [DE])
 [A]  - "ZEMENTGEBUNDENE ASBESTPRODUKTE ERFOLGREICH IM KLINKERBRENNPROZESS ENTSORGT UND VERWERTET CEMENT-BOUND ASBESTOS PRODUCTS SUCCESSFULLY DISPOSED OF AND RECYLCED IN THE CLINKER BURNING PROCESS", ZKG INTERNATIONAL, (1995), vol. 48, no. 11, page A33/A34, XP000628591 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *