Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0906140

EP0906140 - BIODEGRADATION OF METAL CYANIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lattice Intellectual Property Limited
130 Jermyn Street
London SW1Y 4UR / GB
[2001/15]
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
BG plc
100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / KNOWLES, Christopher, John
5 Harbledown Park, Canterbury
Kent CT2 8NR / GB
02 / TETT, Vanessa
89 Whitstable Road, Canterbury
Kent CT2 8EE / GB
03 / BARCLAY, Michelle
21 Oxford Road, Canterbury
Kent CT1 3QF / GB
[1999/14]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Lattice Intellectual Property Ltd
23 Buckingham Gate
London
SW1E 6LB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Illingworth-Law, William , et al
Lattice Intellectual Property Ltd 23 Buckingham Gate
London SW1E 6LB / GB
Former [2000/24]Illingworth-Law, William , et al
BG Intellectual Property Ltd., 100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berks RG6 1PT / GB
Former [1999/14]Morgan, David James , et al
BG plc, Intellectual Property Department, 100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB
Application number, filing date97926101.312.06.1997
[1999/14]
WO1997GB01585
Priority number, dateGB1996001244214.06.1996         Original published format: GB 9612442
[1999/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9747363
Date:18.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0906140
Date:07.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0906140
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:A62D3/00, C02F3/34, C12R1/77, C12R1/80, C12R1/88, B09C1/10
[1999/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/14]
TitleGerman:BIOLOGISCHER ABBAU VON METALLCYANIDEN[1999/14]
English:BIODEGRADATION OF METAL CYANIDES[1999/14]
French:BIODEGRADATION DES CYANURES DE METAL[1999/14]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1999National basic fee paid 
14.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/14]
08.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2001Fee for grant paid
08.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0234760  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,6 * example 4; claim - * [A] 14,15;
 [XA]EP0233719  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,6 * examples 2,3; claim - * [A] 14,15;
 [X]EP0061249  (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 3 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 35 * * page 4, line 12 - line 17 *;
 [A]EP0349348  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - N. NAZLY ET AL, "CYANIDE DEGRADATION BY IMMOBILISED FUNGI.", BIOTECHNOL LETT 3 (7). JULY 1981. PAGES 363-368; CODEN: BILED3 ISSN: 0141-5492, XP002040627 [X] 3 * page 365, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - ARONSTEIN B N ET AL, "Chemical and biological removal of cyanides from aqueous and soil-containing systems.", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY 41 (6). JUNE 1994. 700-707. ISSN: 0175-7598, XP002040628 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
Examination   - M.H. GRANT: "Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Fourth Edition, Volume 14, Page 876", 1995, JOHN WILEY AND SONS , NEW YORK