Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972716

EP0972716 - COVER-CARRYING THIN SHEET STORAGE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAKIZAKI MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
1-18-2 Nishi-Ikebukuro, Toshima-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HYOBU, Yukihiro, Kakizaki Manufacturing Co., Ltd
18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 171 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97926240.913.06.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997JP02044
Priority number, dateJP1997070204413.06.1997         Original published format: JP 70204497
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856676
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972716
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65D43/02, B65D55/02, B65D85/38, B65D85/90, H01L21/68
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:DÜNNWANDIGER LAGERUNGSBEHÄLTER AUSGERÜSTET MIT EINEM DECKEL[2000/03]
English:COVER-CARRYING THIN SHEET STORAGE CONTAINER[2000/03]
French:RECIPIENT EN FEUILLE MINCE POURVU D'UN COUVERCLE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase08.02.1999Translation filed 
08.02.1999National basic fee paid 
08.02.1999Search fee paid 
08.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
07.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH03215960  (EBARA CORP);
 [X]JPH06183467  (EBARA CORP);
 [X]JPH0627954Y  ;
 [X]JPS60160539U  ;
 [X]JPS63131948U  ;
 [Y]JPH0196860U  ;
 [A]JPH0945759  (MITSUBISHI MATERIAL SILICON, et al);
 [A]JPH0185292U  ;
 [A]JPS6287442U