Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0932385

EP0932385 - DEVICES FOR MOVING PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/31]DEVICES FOR MOVING PATIENTS AND METHOD
[2003/27]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lindell, Tom
Mariehamnsgatan 22
164 79 Kista / SE
[1999/31]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Lindgren, Anders , et al
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Lindgren, Anders , et al
Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7
751 43 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date97926318.323.05.1997
[1999/31]
WO1997SE00852
Priority number, dateSE1996000095729.08.1996         Original published format: SE 9600957
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808477
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0932385
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998
[1999/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0932385
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/10
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/31]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN VON KRANKEN[2003/27]
English:DEVICES FOR MOVING PATIENTS[2003/27]
French:DISPOSITIF SERVANT A DEPLACER UN MALADE[2003/27]
Former [1999/31]VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN VON KRANKEN UND VERFAHREN
Former [1999/31]DEVICES FOR MOVING PATIENTS AND METHOD
Former [1999/31]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE SERVANT A DEPLACER UN MALADE
Entry into regional phase29.03.1999National basic fee paid 
29.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/31]
24.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2003Fee for grant paid
02.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Request for further processing for:03.09.2002Request for further processing filed
03.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.09.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199903   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
DE04.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
DE04.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/14]SE03.06.2004
DE04.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/40]SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4028752  ;
 [X]DE3619837  ;
 [Y]US5121514  ;
 [Y]US5329655  ;
 [Y]GB2294883  ;
 [Y]US3284816