Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0897288

EP0897288 - AORTIC OCCLUDER WITH ASSOCIATED FILTER AND METHODS OF USE DURING CARDIAC SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Embol-X Inc.
3200 Alpine Road
Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US
[1999/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BARBUT, Denise
70 East 77th Street
New York, NY 10021-1811 / US
02 / ROOT, Jonathan, D.
38 Parker Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
03 / PASTRONE, Giovanni
17070 Wild Way
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
04 / SELLERS, James, M.
153 Wheelwright Road
Hampstead, NH 03841 / US
05 / RIZZARI, Robert
45 Hancock Street
Haverhill, MA 01830 / US
06 / MAAHS, Tracy, D.
1610 Nantucket Circle, No.213
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
07 / TSUGITA, Ross, S.
1653 Gretel Lane
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
08 / THORNTON, Peter
1416 Fairway Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
09 / SUTTON, Douglas
1595 Adobe Drive
Pacifica, CA 94044 / US
[2000/11]
Former [1999/08]01 / BARBUT, Denise
70 East 77th Street
New York, NY 10021-1811 / US
02 / ROOT, Jonathan, D.
38 Parker Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
03 / PASTRONE, Giovanni
17070 Wild Way
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
04 / SELLERS, James, M.
153 Wheelwright Road
Hampstead, NH 03841 / US
05 / RIZZARI, Robert
45 Hancock Street
Haverhill, MA 01830 / US
06 / MAAHS, Tracy, D.
312 Sequoia Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
07 / TSUGITA, Ross, S.
1653 Gretel Lane
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
08 / THORNTON, Peter
1416 Fairway Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
09 / SUTTON, Douglas
1595 Adobe Drive
Pacifica, CA 94044 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [1999/47]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Steinsdorfstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/08]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Essener Strasse 5
46047 Oberhausen / DE
Application number, filing date97926456.112.05.1997
[1999/08]
WO1997US07977
Priority number, dateUS1996064576214.05.1996         Original published format: US 645762
[1999/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9742879
Date:20.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0897288
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997
[1999/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00, A61B17/12, A61F2/01
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/08]A61B17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/08]
TitleGerman:AORTENOKKLUDER MIT DAZUGEHÖRIGEM FILTER UND GEBRAUCHSVERFAHREN WÄHREND DER HERZCHIRURGIE[1999/08]
English:AORTIC OCCLUDER WITH ASSOCIATED FILTER AND METHODS OF USE DURING CARDIAC SURGERY[1999/08]
French:DISPOSITIF D'OCCLUSION AORTIQUE A FILTRE ASSOCIE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION AU COURS D'UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE[1999/08]
Entry into regional phase11.12.1998National basic fee paid 
11.12.1998Search fee paid 
11.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/08]
13.11.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/35]
28.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4572724  (ROSENBERG DAVID J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5433700  (PETERS WILLIAM S [AU])