Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901421

EP0901421 - A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A MANUALLY OPENABLE RIGID ROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fioravanti S.r.l.
Via Avogadro 12/A
10121 Torino / IT
[1999/41]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Fioravanti S.r.l.
Corso Vinzaglio, 16
I-10121 Torino / IT
Inventor(s)01 / FIORAVANTI, Leonardo
Strada S. Brigida, 68
I-10024 Moncalieri / IT
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Jacobacci, Filippo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Jacobacci, Filippo , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date97927050.127.05.1997
[1999/11]
WO1997EP02729
Priority number, dateIT1996TO00120U29.05.1996         Original published format: IT TO960120 U
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9745285
Date:04.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0901421
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997
[1999/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0901421
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60J7/16
[1999/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/11]
TitleGerman:MOTORFAHRZEUG MIT RIGIDEM DACH UND MANUELLER BEDIENUNG[1999/11]
English:A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A MANUALLY OPENABLE RIGID ROOF[1999/11]
French:VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE A TOIT RIGIDE S'OUVRANT MANUELLEMENT[1999/11]
Entry into regional phase21.12.1998National basic fee paid 
21.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/11]
30.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4950022  (PATTEE CLARK C [US]) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 2