Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0902991

EP0902991 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH
Hauptstrasse 150
53797 Lohmar / DE
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[1999/12]
Inventor(s)01 / BRÜCK, Rolf
Fröbelstrasse 12
D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / HIRTH, Peter
Veilchenweg 35
D-51107 Köln / DE
03 / BERGAU, Norbert
Strunkhausen 10
D-53804 Much / DE
04 / ALBIEZ, Robert
Waldingerstrasse 68
D-85084 Reichertshofen / DE
05 / GRÖBMAIR, Maximilian
Linden/Baiernrainer Weg 10
D-83623 Dietramszell / DE
06 / OTTO, Erhard
Am Muehlbachbogen 18 D
D-85368 Moosburg / DE
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Kahlhöfer, Hermann , et al
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann
Rössler Heine PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle,Pagenberg,Dost,Altenburg,Geissler,Isenbruck Uerdinger Str. 5
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97927116.003.06.1997
[1999/12]
WO1997EP02873
Priority number, dateDE199612240604.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19622406
[1999/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9747057
Date:11.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0902991
Date:24.03.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997
[1999/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0902991
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R11/28
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/12]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSBILDUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDUNG[1999/12]
English:DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTION[1999/12]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE[1999/12]
Entry into regional phase15.12.1998National basic fee paid 
15.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/12]
10.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2000Fee for grant paid
13.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DXY]GB449934  (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [DX] 1-4,6-8,14,15 * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 33; figure . * [Y] 12;
 [DX]FR740843  (EXPANDING BATTERY POST COMPANY) [DX] 1-3,5-7,9,14,15 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 18; figures 3,4 *;
 [DX]DE2104036  (AMP INC) [DX] 1-3,6-8,11,14,15 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 33; figures 1,2 *;
 [XA]US3457542  (WOLF RAYMOND J) [X] 1,2,14,15 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 21; figure 2 * [A] 10,11;
 [Y]US5436216  (TOYAO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 12 * abstract * * column 25, line 3 - line 9; figure 55 *